Robert L. Steinberg v. Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Plaintiff: Robert L. Steinberg
Defendant: Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03743
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Voluntary Dismissal filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Mediation Deadline filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER. Mediation deadline 9/15/2016. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 10/7/2016. Deadline to file class certification motion 4/21/2017. Class certification opposition 5/19/2017. Class certification reply 6/2/2017. He aring on class certification motion 6/22/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Fact discovery cut-off 3/24/2017. Expert disclosures 7/28/2017. Expert rebuttal 8/25/2017. Expert discovery cut-off 9/29/2017. Deadline to file d ispositive motions 9/29/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 12/22/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 1/29/2018 - 2/8/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for August 10, 2016 is vacated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 28 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule, Continuing Hearing, and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016).
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint; Motion to Strike filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/31/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert L. Steinberg v. Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Steinberg
Represented By: George Haksoo Kim
Represented By: Kyle A. Shamberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Represented By: Stacy R. Hovan
Represented By: J. Christopher Mitchell
Represented By: Neil Richard O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?