IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. et al v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. and IXI IP,LLC
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd and Samsung Electronics America Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv03752
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STAY. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
January 7, 2016 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STAY. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/7/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
November 12, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING(121 in case 3:15-cv-03754-HSG; 106 in case 3:15-cv-03755-HSG; and 119 in case 3:15-cv-03752-HSG MOTION TO STAY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
October 14, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (126 in case 3:15-cv-03754-HSG; 110 in case 3:15-cv-03755-HSG; 121 in case 3:15-cv-03752-HSG Motion to Continue the Date of the Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 1, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 112 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Rokach (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 28, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 110 Motion to Expedite Hearing Date of Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 24, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 101 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mark W. Halderman (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 9, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 92 Motion to Relate Cases 15-cv-3754-RS and 15-cv-3755-PJH. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 25, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. et al v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas Steven Biemer
Represented By: Gary David Colby
Represented By: Jennifer S. Coleman
Represented By: Marie-Theres DiFillippo
Represented By: Mark William Halderman
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Aleksandr Korzh
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: Joshua David Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IXI IP,LLC
Represented By: Thomas Steven Biemer
Represented By: Gary David Colby
Represented By: Jennifer S. Coleman
Represented By: Marie-Theres DiFillippo
Represented By: Mark William Halderman
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Aleksandr Korzh
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: Joshua David Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Represented By: Gregory Steven Arovas
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: James E. Marina
Represented By: James Henry McConnell
Represented By: David Rokach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Gregory Steven Arovas
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: James E. Marina
Represented By: James Henry McConnell
Represented By: David Rokach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?