Brightbill et al v. General Motors, LLC

Plaintiff: Joel Brightbill and Patricia Payeur
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03789
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the action is dismissed with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/16/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
May 16, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/16/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
March 30, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently set for April 15, 2016, is continued to May 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
December 28, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 28, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 2, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 15, 2016, to April 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 24, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 3, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
September 30, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring case to the Hon. Samuel Conti for consideration of whether it is related to Case No. 15-cv-00741-SC. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/30/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brightbill et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Brightbill
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Payeur
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Dommond Edward Lonnie
Represented By: Derek Scott Whitefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?