Juan Pablo Lopez v. County of Los Angeles et al

Plaintiff: Juan Pablo Lopez
Defendant: County of Los Angeles, County of San Mateo, Jordan Boyd, Andy Armando, William Massey, California Department of Motor Vehicles and City of Torrance
Case Number: 3:2015cv03804
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson denying 41 Motion for Attorney Fees. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
January 5, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed on 01/05/16. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 1, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 11 Defendant Department of Motor Vehicles' Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Defendant County of Los Angeles' Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
October 28, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Plaintiff's Failure to Respond to Motions and Failure to Appear. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/9/2015 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/4/2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/28/15. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan Pablo Lopez v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pablo Lopez
Represented By: David Walter Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Kevin John Engelien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Represented By: Sandra Christine Zuniga Nierenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Boyd
Represented By: Sandra Christine Zuniga Nierenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Armando
Represented By: Sandra Christine Zuniga Nierenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Massey
Represented By: Sandra Christine Zuniga Nierenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Motor Vehicles
Represented By: John P. Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?