Ed Daie v. Aetna Life Insurance Company, et al

Plaintiff: Ed Daie
Defendant: Intel Corporation, The Reed Group and Claim Appeal Fiduciary Services
Case Number: 3:2015cv03813
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE by Hon. William Alsup granting 40 Motion to Relate Case.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 10, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING AS MOOT MOTION RE VENUE, OR TRANSFER; ORDER TO REMAND, Motions terminated: 10 , 11 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 22, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR FURTHER INFORMATION Responses due by 10/26/2015 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/22/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 16, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 6, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 10, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup granting 18 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 9, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER: Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/9/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
September 4, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 31, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/31/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ed Daie v. Aetna Life Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Nancy Baughman Pridgen
Represented By: Walter Maurizio Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Reed Group
Represented By: Nancy Baughman Pridgen
Represented By: Walter Maurizio Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claim Appeal Fiduciary Services
Represented By: Nancy Baughman Pridgen
Represented By: Walter Maurizio Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Daie
Represented By: Ray Francis Bourhis
Represented By: Eric Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?