Joseph F. Frankl v. Bauer's Intelligent Transportation, Inc.

Petitioner: Joseph F. Frankl
Respondent: Bauer's Intelligent Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03829
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:160
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 15, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE UNDER 29 U.S.C. SECTION 160(j) re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Joseph F. Frankl. Status Report due by 1/13/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 15, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
August 26, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/1/2015 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 25, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph F. Frankl v. Bauer's Intelligent Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bauer's Intelligent Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Gayland Pedhirney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph F. Frankl
Represented By: Jill Hawken Coffman
Represented By: Christy Jiwon Kwon
Represented By: Carmen Leon
Represented By: Marta Novoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?