Hello Network, Inc. v. Hello and Hola Media, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hello Network, Inc.
Defendant: Hello and Hola Media, Inc., Hola S.L. and Hello Limited
Case Number: 3:2015cv03838
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Claims filed by Hello Network, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 22, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Hello Network, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
December 21, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 2/1/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 5/31/2016. Expert disclosures 6/30/2016. Expert rebuttal 7/29/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 8/19/2016. Deadline to file dispositive and Daub ert motions 10/6/2016. Oppositions to dispositive and Daubert motions 11/3/2016. Reply briefs in support of dispositive and Daubert motions 11/17/2016. Hearing date on dispositive and Daubert motions 12/1/2016. Pretrial conferen ce statement due 1/3/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2017 - 2/67/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hello Network, Inc. v. Hello and Hola Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hello Network, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Ball
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hello and Hola Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hola S.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hello Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?