International Medcom, Inc. v. S.E. International, Inc.

Plaintiff: International Medcom, Inc.
Defendant: S.E. International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03839
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 80 STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 21, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 76 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Ryan Levy. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
September 30, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL RE Docket No. 68 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/30/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
December 2, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S 27 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
September 18, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice John F. Triggs. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Medcom, Inc. v. S.E. International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Medcom, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Edward Dersham
Represented By: Carlton John Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.E. International, Inc.
Represented By: John Dennis O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?