Lim v. The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC et al

Plaintiff: Enrique Lim
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC, Marriott International Administrative Services, Inc. and Jorg Kelly-Schade
Case Number: 3:2015cv03850
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CANCEL THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO DISMISS THIS CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/16/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
December 10, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial set for 11/1/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/10/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
August 31, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/31/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lim v. The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Lim
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Represented By: Parveen Kaur Tumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company LLC
Represented By: Constance Elizabeth Norton
Represented By: Angela Joy Rafoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International Administrative Services, Inc.
Represented By: Constance Elizabeth Norton
Represented By: Angela Joy Rafoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorg Kelly-Schade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?