Rosen .v Uber Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Stewart Rosen
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier, LLC and Rasier-CA, LLC
Miscellaneous: The People of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2015cv03866
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 82 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
February 16, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant Class Expert Designation and Report filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
November 14, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Re: Limited Modifications to Scheduling Order in Rosen Action filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
March 7, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DATE FOR FILING OF FRCP, RULE 26(f) DISCLOSURE TO MARCH 14, 2016 filed by Stewart Rosen. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 23, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying 22 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
September 14, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/14/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosen .v Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Rosen
Represented By: Harold Mitchell Jaffe
Represented By: Brian West Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier-CA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: The People of the State of California
Represented By: Ernst Andrew Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?