Perez v. Monster Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Perez
Defendant: Monster Inc. and Best Buy Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03885
Filed: August 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 164 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Case closed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 110 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 96 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Expedited Hearing; and denying 98 Defendants' Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re Production Deadline. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/5/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 84 Defendants' Motion to Shorten Time. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Regarding Timeline for Monster's Production of Documents 74 , 77 Discovery Letter Briefs.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER to Plaintiff to file legible copies of images and archived websites referenced in 74 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Benjamin Perez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/30/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 35 Amended Complaint EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bestbuy.com LLC, Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, LP, Monster Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 22 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion to Dismiss 22 . Responses due by 11/20/2015. Replies due by 12/11/2015. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re 15 Stipulation filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Monster Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/9/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/27/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Monster Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Perez
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Julia A. Luster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?