Lloyd T Whitaker v. Daniel G Hickey , Jr. et al

Plaintiff: Lloyd T. Whitaker
Defendant: Daniel G Hickey , Jr., Daniel G Hickey, Sr., James J. Scardino, Chester J. Walczyk, Joseph F. Taylor, Keith Hynes and David M. Birsner
Case Number: 3:2015cv03904
Filed: August 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS UPDATE by Judge Alsup on 10/11/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 7, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING STAY AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE 39 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
July 26, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STAY.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/26/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
May 24, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/24/16. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
February 1, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 4/25/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/1/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 12, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/12/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 11, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR MEDIATION/SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/11/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
December 17, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STAY AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 46 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 16, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/16/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 10, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 9, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 33 34 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEYS PAIGE WILLAN AND MICHAEL CORAN (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
November 23, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 10, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 26 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY NICHOLAS DICARLO.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
September 14, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd T Whitaker v. Daniel G Hickey , Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd T. Whitaker
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Farrow
Represented By: Steven C. Reingold
Represented By: John Arthur Sebastinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G Hickey , Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G Hickey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Scardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester J. Walczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Hynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Birsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?