Tucker et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gregory K. Tucker and Rebecca Tucker
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03930
Filed: August 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/3/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 20, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany L. Carpenter. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 14, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. REGARDING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DAUBERT MOTIONS (denying 79 Motion to Shorten Time as moot). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 13, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bavol, Charles. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
August 9, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 51 Joint Stipulation of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice; terminating 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
June 3, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. ( 40 Stipulated Protective Order terminated). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/3/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 9, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 6, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 33 Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Pretrial and Trial Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
March 17, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mary C. Dirkes.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
December 23, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Kell. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 3, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 2, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/2/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 12, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K. Tucker
Represented By: Joseph Harry Fagundes
Represented By: Amber C Lance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Tucker
Represented By: Joseph Harry Fagundes
Represented By: Amber C Lance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Gillette
Represented By: Daniel J. Herling
Represented By: Mina Nasseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?