Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Danco Builders

Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Danco Builders
Case Number: 3:2015cv03945
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 108 Motion to Alter Judgment. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
June 27, 2017 105 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
January 3, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 71 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
November 16, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CUT-OFF DATES - Dispositive motions to be heard by 2/15/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
August 23, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 20, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue deadline to file dispositive motions. Dispositive motions to be heard by 12/7/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 28, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Stipulation to Continue Cut-Off Dates. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 13, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 STIPULATION. Fact discovery cutoff: 7/19/2016. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 11/2/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2017 02:00 PM and Bench Trial set for 2/13/2017 08:00 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco, before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/13/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
March 22, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 47 Motion to Dismiss. Schmidbauer shall answer the Third Amended Complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
January 28, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
December 1, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Philadelphia Indemnity may file an amended complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order. The Second Amended Complaint has no effect. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 3, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 18 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Danco Builders. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/3/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Danco Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Nelson Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danco Builders
Represented By: John Steven Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?