Porter v. Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Porter
Defendant: Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03961
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/24/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
July 1, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE WESTMORE FOR SETTLEMENT.Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 9/1/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/1/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
May 3, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 59 Notice of Settlement filed by Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 01:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/3/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
March 31, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 1/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Franci sco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017-1/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/31/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
October 16, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 18 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucasfilm Ltd. LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Aparicio
Represented By: Emilio German Gonzalez
Represented By: Jacklina Alica Len
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Porter
Represented By: Teresa Susan Renaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?