Continental Casualty Company v. Recology Inc.

Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Defendant: Recology Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03969
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/26/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
February 2, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Stipulation ADDING ADDITIONAL PARTIES TO THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/2/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 26, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 30 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 7, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RECOLOGY, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING TIMES filed by Recology Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/6/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 28, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 47 SPECIALTY RISK SERVICES, LLC.'s STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Third Party Complaint to January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/28/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015) Modified on 12/28/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/28/2015 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1)/ALLOW FOR SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION FOR AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/29/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 20, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 16-2(e) AND 7-12 filed by Recology Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/20/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 7, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting further request to extend time to respond to the initial complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/6/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Casualty Company v. Recology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recology Inc.
Represented By: Burton Elliott Falk
Represented By: Charles Reinhardt Rondeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Geoffrey David Godwin
Represented By: Megan Colleen Hamilton
Represented By: Edward James Tafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?