Ditlevson v. Legal Express, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Ditlevson
Defendant: Legal Express, Ltd. and Kraig Vorsatz
Case Number: 3:2015cv03977
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 23, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/23/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
April 26, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. The parties' deadline to complete mediation is extended to July 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
February 23, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. The deadline for the parties to complete mediation is extended to May 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
December 7, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/7/15. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 2, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 1, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER. Counsel for plaintiff and defendant may appear by telephone at the Case Management Conference scheduled for December 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 25, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; AFFORDING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER; VACATING HEARING. If Legal Express wishes to amend its answer, it shall file an amended answer no later than December 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 16, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Defendant Legal Express is ordered to submit a chambers copy of its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditlevson v. Legal Express, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Ditlevson
Represented By: Raeon Rodrigo Roulston
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Express, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraig Vorsatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?