Clifton v. Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company

Plaintiff: Carr Clifton
Defendant: Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv03985
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Plumas
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/8/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
December 23, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/23/2015.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
October 2, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/2/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifton v. Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carr Clifton
Represented By: Alexander Rice Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company
Represented By: James Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?