Washburn v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Gina Washburn
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv04009
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 25, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Stipulation For Relief From Order Setting Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/24/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
September 10, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Filing Of Amended Complaint And Schedule For Filing Responsive Pleading filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/9/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washburn v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Washburn
Represented By: Robert M. Bramson
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Genshlea
Represented By: Jennifer Susan Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kelly Denise Fair
Represented By: Laura Leigh Geist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?