Hernandez v. Colvin

Plaintiff: David Edward Hernandez
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv04032
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
February 23, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, Motions terminated: 15 . Cross Motions due by 5/22/2016. Supplemental or Corrected Administrative Record due by 3/23/2016. Motions due by 4/22/2016. Replies due by 6/5/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/23/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
October 19, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SUMMONS AND SERVICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Edward Hernandez
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?