Vargas v. Allstate Insurance Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Julia E. Vargas
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv04041
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
January 20, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES: Discovery due by 12/9/2016. Expert Witness List due by 1/9/2017. Jury Selection set for 3/17/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland befor e Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Allstate Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia E. Vargas
Represented By: Peter W. Clerides
Represented By: Nicolas Spiros Gikkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Inc
Represented By: Michael Barnes
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Elizabeth Throne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?