Arviso et al v. Smartpay Leasing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Linda Arviso and Schaminka Weaver
Defendant: Smartpay Leasing, Inc., Better Finance, Inc. and Billfloat, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04087
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 42 Stipulation filed by Linda Arviso, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/31/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
July 28, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Spero on 7/28/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
March 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson denying 30 Motion to Stay Discovery. Plaintiff shall serve new discovery requests that comply with this Order no later than 03/24/16. Parties shall propose a briefing schedule and hearing date on the pending motion to compel arbitration no later than 10 days after discovery is completed. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016).
January 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Briefing Deadlines Regarding Defendant Smartpay Leasing, Inc's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/28/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arviso et al v. Smartpay Leasing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Arviso
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schaminka Weaver
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartpay Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billfloat, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?