Quinby et al v. Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jaimie Quinby, Linda Gomes and Eric Fontes
Defendant: Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04099
Filed: September 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARDS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/18/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
March 9, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVISING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES TO PERMIT MEDIATION granting 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/09/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
December 7, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 STIPULATION to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to 1/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/19/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinby et al v. Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaimie Quinby
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Jennifer Lin Liu
Represented By: Jenny Snay Yelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gomes
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Jennifer Lin Liu
Represented By: Jenny Snay Yelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fontes
Represented By: Gay Crosthwait Grunfeld
Represented By: Jennifer Lin Liu
Represented By: Jenny Snay Yelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
Represented By: Kai-Ching Cha
Represented By: John C Kloosterman
Represented By: Alexis Anne Sohrakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?