Johnson v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: G Grant Johnson
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv04138
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
May 24, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 STIPULATION to Continue CMC. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2017. Case Management Conference continued to 7/11/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 22, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, CLASS CERTIFICATION AND EVIDENCE by Judge William H. Orrick denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 37 Motion to Certify Class; denying 38 Motion in Limine; granting 47 Motion to Strike ; granting 53 Motion to Strike. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
November 30, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/30/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G Grant Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Lorraine Freeland
Represented By: Ivo Michael Labar
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Beth Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?