Lai v. The Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco

Plaintiff: Eric Lai
Defendant: The Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco, Fook Puy Lai and Irene Lai
Case Number: 3:2015cv04142
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/06/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
December 10, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 23, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO ADVANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 19 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference advanced to 12/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/23/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lai v. The Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco
Represented By: Chad Davis Greeson
Represented By: Nandor Burton Krause
Represented By: Derek Henry Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fook Puy Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lai
Represented By: Spencer James Pahlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?