Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.153.167

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.153.167
Case Number: 3:2015cv04173
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 59 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
August 4, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT by Hon. William Alsup granting 44 Motion to Set Aside Default.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
February 5, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 2, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE, Motions terminated: 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Malibu Media, LLC, 26 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Malibu Media, LLC.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/2/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 19, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 17, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 21 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 14, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL THIRD-PARTY MATERIAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 19 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 23, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/23/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
October 18, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting 11 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.153.167
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Brenna Elsie Erlbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.153.167
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?