Raney v. Twitter, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wilford Raney
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04191
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 45 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE, Motions terminated: 30 Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2016. Motions due by 11/9/2015. Replies due by 1/8/2016. Responses due by 12/9/2015. Class Cert responses due by 3/10/2016, class c ert reply due by 3/24/2016 Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/4/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO STAY by Hon. William Alsup granting 26 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/30/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY RAFEY S. BALABANIAN by Hon. William Alsup granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF POTENTIAL CONFLICT Objections due by 9/29/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/25/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raney v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilford Raney
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Samuel Lasser
Represented By: Amir Cheyenne Missaghi
Represented By: Alexander Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?