Allstate Insurance Company v. Driveway Software Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Driveway Software Corporation, Jake Diner and Igor Katsman
Case Number: 3:2015cv04209
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/10/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 3, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SECOND REQUEST FOR CONTINAUNCE 44 . Further Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/3/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 26, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE 42 . Case Management Statement or dismissal due by 5/3/2016 noon. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/26/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
February 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: SETTLEMENT AND 60 DAY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS 39 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/22/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
December 16, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Re: Dkt. No. 25 Case referred to the Court's ADR Unit for mediation to be completed by 2/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Updated Case Management Statement due by 3/2/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/16/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 11, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Re: Dkt. No. 25 . Any party wishing to keep the CMC on calendar must notify opposing counsel and the Courtroom Deputy [408.535.5343] by noon on December 14. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/11/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Driveway Software Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter Haviland
Represented By: Scott S. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driveway Software Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Diner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor Katsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?