Graham v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Michelle A Graham
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04220
Filed: September 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/10/2017. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER and Vacating Hearing on 10 Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 12, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/2/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/23/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle A Graham
Represented By: Nicole Cherones
Represented By: David L Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?