Smith v. City of Berkeley et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Smith
Defendant: City of Berkeley, City of Berkeley Medical Cannabis Commission, Berkeley Patients Care Collective, Berkeley City Council, Berkeley Patients Group and Cannabis Buyers Club of Berkeley
Case Number: 3:2015cv04227
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/21/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 4, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES by Hon. William Alsup denying 34 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 2, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 9, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, Defendant's Notice Due 11/12/2015 Replies due by 11/17/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/9/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 5, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2015 AT NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/5/2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City of Berkeley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Smith
Represented By: G. Whitney Leigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Represented By: Rachel Chatman
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley Medical Cannabis Commission
Represented By: Rachel Chatman
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Patients Care Collective
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley City Council
Represented By: Rachel Chatman
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Patients Group
Represented By: John Lofton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannabis Buyers Club of Berkeley
Represented By: William C. Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?