Langridge v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jessica Langridge
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2015cv04235
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/8/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
November 2, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STANDARD OF REVIEW by Judge Chhabria denying 28 Motion. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
August 2, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/2/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
February 5, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 11 Stipulation. The Court ORDERS as follows: (1) Default as to Liberty Mutual is set aside; (2) Plaintiff's claims against Liberty Mutual are dismissed without prejudice; (3) U.S. Roche Health and Welfare Benefits VEBA Plan is s ubstituted as a defendant for Liberty Mutual; (4) Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint to reflect said substitution; and (5) U.S. Roche's response to the amended complaint shall be due 20 days after it is filed and served. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/5/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
December 1, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/1/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langridge v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Langridge
Represented By: Jessica M. Cho
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?