Vachani v. Yakovlev et al
Plaintiff: Steven Vachani and Serendipity Ventures, Inc
Defendant: Arthur Yakovlev and Lucien Peres
Case Number: 3:2015cv04296
Filed: September 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 52 Motion for Default Judgment. Because the court holds that it cannot exercise personal jurisdiction, the defendants are dismissed from this suit. The plaintiffs have now had multiple opportunities to esta blish personal jurisdiction. Further amendment would appear to be futile. The court therefore dismisses the defendants without prejudice to the plaintiffs' claims against them, but without leave to amend the pleadings in this case. The court directs the clerk of court to close this file. This disposes of ECF No. 52. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 44 Motion for Default Judgment. The court grants leave to amend or submit supplemental briefs within three weeks from the date of this order: i.e., by Thursday, April 27, 2017.(lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/2/2017 11:00 AM. As the attached order describes, the court has twice continued the case to allow counsel to file a default-judgment motion. Most recently, the court continued the cas e-management conference to March 2, 2017, and asked counsel to file the default-judgment motion no later than February 23, 2017, or declare why a further extension is needed. As of February 27, counsel had not filed the motion or an update. The court already has a status hearing set for Thursday, March 2, 2017, at 11 a.m. The court now orders the plaintiffs to show cause at that hearing why their case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute it. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 34 Motion for Default Judgment. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 24 Motion for Default Judgment. The court denies the plaintiffs' motion for default judgment. The plaintiffs have not shown that this court can exercise personal jurisdiction over the defendants. Th e plaintiffs may amend their complaint, or supplement their default-judgment submissions, or both. If they file an amended complaint, they must obtain a new entry of default, and can then file a new motion for default judgment. The plaintiffs must serve any new motion for default judgment on the defendants by all reasonable means. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vachani v. Yakovlev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Vachani
Represented By: Amy Sommer Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serendipity Ventures, Inc
Represented By: Amy Sommer Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Yakovlev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucien Peres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?