Randall v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Deborah Randall
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Verizon Wireless Managed Disability Benefit Plan, Verizon Wireless Group Medical Plan and Verizon Wireless Life and Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan
Case Number: 3:2015cv04343
Filed: September 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
November 9, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 33 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Hearing and Extend Briefing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
September 19, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: STANDARD OF REVIEW filed by Deborah Randall. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
January 27, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Mediation filed by Verizon Wireless Life and Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan, Verizon Wireless Managed Disability Benefit Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Verizon Wireless Group Medical Plan. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Randall
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Managed Disability Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Group Medical Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Life and Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?