Sabawoon Salim Construction Co. v. ECC International LLC et al

Petitioner: Sabawoon Salim Construction Co.
Respondent: ECC International LLC and ECC Centcom Constructors LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv04362
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Liberty Mutual's Motion for Hearing on Third Party Claim. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 24, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Supplemental Briefing on 40 Liberty Mutual's motion for a hearing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/24/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
February 23, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued as to ECC International, LLC in the amount of $4,064,552.60 (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
December 3, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by ECC Centcom Constructors LLC, ECC International LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
October 23, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND JUDGMENT re 25 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 22, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 for Entry of Order Confirming Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment Based Thereon filed by Sabawoon Salim Construction Co., JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 010/22/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabawoon Salim Construction Co. v. ECC International LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sabawoon Salim Construction Co.
Represented By: Marshall Alton Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Tod Lawrence Gamlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ECC International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ECC Centcom Constructors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?