Zarate v. United States Government

Petitioner: Eladier Zarate
Respondent: United States Government
Case Number: 3:2015cv04367
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER NOT RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/29/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 25, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/25/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE DOCUMENT NUMBER 5*** ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/24/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015) Modified on 9/24/2015 (sv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zarate v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eladier Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?