Desoto Cab Company, Inc. v. Picker et al

Plaintiff: Desoto Cab Company, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Picker, Mike Florio, Catherine J.K. Sandoval, Carla J. Peterman and Liane M. Randolph
Case Number: 3:2015cv04375
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 53 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
July 20, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 31 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
April 19, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Order to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply Briefing for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Desoto Cab Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/19/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
October 29, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/29/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desoto Cab Company, Inc. v. Picker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Picker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine J.K. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla J. Peterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liane M. Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desoto Cab Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Isaac Bautista
Represented By: Shannon Michele Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?