Gail Morales v. Cal eConnect, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gail Morales
Defendant: Cal eConnect, Inc. and Laura Landry
Case Number: 3:2015cv04383
Filed: September 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL (30 days conditional). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/19/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
January 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Telephone Conference set for 2/29/2016 at 11:00 AM. Settlement Conference set for 3/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/21/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 10, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
October 7, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 Stipulation for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Gail Morales. David Lansky, Donald Crane and David Joyner terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/6/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gail Morales v. Cal eConnect, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal eConnect, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Michele Cooper
Represented By: Lara Villarreal Hutner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Landry
Represented By: Lauren Michele Cooper
Represented By: Lara Villarreal Hutner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Morales
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?