Deltaway Operations Services, LLC v. Global Ampersand, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Deltaway Operations Services, LLC
Defendant: Global Ampersand, LLC, Akeida Capital Management, LLC and David Kandohla
Case Number: 3:2015cv04473
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/26/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016) Modified on 7/26/2016 (ig, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 43 Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related dates. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
February 10, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/10/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 5, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES [* AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] re [Dkt. No. 17] Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2016 is CONTINUED to 2/8/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/5/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deltaway Operations Services, LLC v. Global Ampersand, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deltaway Operations Services, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Kaiho Yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Ampersand, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akeida Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kandohla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?