Thomas A Michalski v. Carolyn Colvin

Plaintiff: Thomas A. Michalski
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv04483
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 24 Plaintiff's Counsel's Petition for Approval of Attorney Fees. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
December 6, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 for the Award and Payment of Attorney's Fees and Expenses Pursuant to the EAJA filed by Thomas A. Michalski. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
September 2, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 16 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
June 8, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment with Proposed Order filed by Thomas A. Michalski. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 9, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 Extending Plaintiff's Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas A. Michalski. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas A Michalski v. Carolyn Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Michalski
Represented By: Dolly Marlo Trompeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?