City of Half Moon Bay v. Great American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: City of Half Moon Bay
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Group, American National Fire Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv04500
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court Standby Order of Dismissal. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/9/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/2/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/30/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
December 28, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINE TO FILE STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED DECEMBER 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/28/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 5, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
October 4, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 47 Re: Dismissal of All Claims Against Great American Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York and Great American Insurance Group and Dismissal of All Related Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 38 RE CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/6/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
January 7, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2017 at 10:00 AM; Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/2/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Half Moon Bay v. Great American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Half Moon Bay
Represented By: Austin Byrne Conley, Jr.
Represented By: Peter Alexander Urhausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: William Joseph Baron
Represented By: Colleen Ann Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Group
Represented By: William Joseph Baron
Represented By: Colleen Ann Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Hayes
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen M. Hayes
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?