Musgrave v. Quincy Bioscience, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rick Musgrave
Defendant: Quincy Bioscience, LLC and Quincy Bioscience Holding Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04505
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT CONSOLIDATE THE RACIES AND MUSGRAVE CASES. Show Cause Response due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/20/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 6, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation selecting Private ADR (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
December 30, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musgrave v. Quincy Bioscience, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Musgrave
Represented By: Ronald A Marron
Represented By: Beatrice Skye Resendes
Represented By: William Bradford Richards, Jr.
Represented By: Alexis Marie Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Orr
Represented By: Joshua G. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Bioscience Holding Co., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Orr
Represented By: Joshua G. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?