Hirsch et al v. Brentwood Union School District et al

Plaintiff: Adam Hirsch and Camron Ballesteros
Defendant: Brentwood Union School District, Dina Holder, Constance Forrest, Lauri James and Margaret Kruse
Case Number: 3:2015cv04508
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 16 Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
June 29, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 52 . Hearing re Joint Discovery Letter is reset for 8/11/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
May 25, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF DINA HOLDER: Re 48 Letter filed by Dina Holder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/25/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 16, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Re 46 Letter filed by Margaret Kruse, Lauri James, Constance Forrest, Brentwood Union School District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/16/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
January 26, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 21, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 STIPULATION to continue hearing to and extend deadlines to file response and reply. Responses due by 1/28/2016. Replies due by 2/4/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/21/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 12, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Reference and ORDER re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/12/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 22, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER denying motion to relate case no. 14-cv-4799-PJH (docket no. 135). Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/22/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 2, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT.Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsch et al v. Brentwood Union School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Hirsch
Represented By: Peter Wayne Alfert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camron Ballesteros
Represented By: Peter Wayne Alfert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauri James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?