Batuhan v. Assurity Financial Services, et al

Plaintiff: Eleanor A. Batuhan
Defendant: Assurity Financial Services, LLC and Caliber Home Loans
Case Number: 3:2015cv04526
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 46 Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Eleanor A. Batuhan. Caliber shall file any response to this request by June 1, 2016. The response shall be no more than five pages in length. Batuhan's reply, if any, is due by June 8, 2016 and shall also be no more than five pages. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/18/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
February 10, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING FORECLOSURE-RELATED ACTION TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The ADR Unit will notify the parties of the date and time the telephone conference will be held. After the telephone conference, the ADR Unit will advise t he Court of its recommendation for further ADR proceedings. The motion hearing set for February 17, 2016 and the case management conference set for March 8, 2016 are VACATED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/10/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
October 26, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/26/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batuhan v. Assurity Financial Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor A. Batuhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurity Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans
Represented By: Kristine Elizabeth Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?