Washington v. Kindred Healthcare, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Belencia Washington
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare, Inc. and Kindred Nursing Centers West, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv04528
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS MODIFIED re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Belencia Washington, Kindred Nursing Centers West, LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/24/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 6, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/21/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/6/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
July 28, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ; Stipulation and Federal Rule Of Evidence 502(d) [Proposed] Order filed by Belencia Washington, Kindred Healthcare, Inc., Kindred Nursing Centers West, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/28/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
June 7, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Joint Stipulation to Continue ADR Session Deadline to August 15, 2016 filed by Belencia Washington, Kindred Healthcare, Inc., Kindred Nursing Centers West, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/7/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
February 4, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Belencia Washington filed by Belencia Washington, Kindred Healthcare, Inc., Kindred Nursing Centers West, LLC, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/4/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 3, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 21 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 02/03/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 14, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Show Cause Response due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/14/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Kindred Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belencia Washington
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Nursing Centers West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?