White v. Square, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert E. White
Defendant: Square, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04539
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 61 Motion for New Trial. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
September 14, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
July 11, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Robert E. White. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 16, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order filed by Square, Inc. Fact discovery cut-off 11/1/2016. Expert Disclosures 11/21/2016. Expert rebuttal 12/19/2016. Exp ert discovery cut-off 1/13/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions 2/2/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 3/21/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 5/8/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 4, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Briefing Schedule in Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Square, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 19, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
March 7, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Square, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Square, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
January 13, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 2/29/2016. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Fact discovery cu t-off 8/1/2016. Expert disclosures 8/19/2016. Expert rebuttal 9/9/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 9/23/2016. Deadline to file dispositive motions 10/7/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 12/13/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2017 - 2/9/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 7, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Robert E. White. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Square, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. White
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Frank R. Ubhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square, Inc.
Represented By: Colleen Bal
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Rowe
Represented By: Jacob Thayer Veltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?