Jeanne Stathakos, et al v. Columbia Sportswear Company

Plaintiff: Jeanne Stathakos and Nicolas Stathakos
Defendant: Columbia Sportswear Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv04543
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2017 116 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/20/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
May 11, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO STRIKE EXPERTS; GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting in part 61 Motion to Ce rtify Class; granting in part 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion to Exclude Dr. Goldaper ; granting in part 77 Motion to exclude Dr. Compeau and STRIKES paragraphs from his Expert Report. Plaintiff Notice of Intent filed within 14 days of this Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 25, 2017 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS re 93 Objection, filed by Columbia Sportswear Company. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/25/17. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 24, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING BRIEFS OR PORTIONS THEREOF FOR VIOLATIONS OF LOCAL RULE 7-3(D) RE: SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIAL re 92 Statement of Recent Decision, filed by Nicolas Stathakos, Jeanne Stathakos, 90 Objection, filed by Columbia Sportswear USA Corporation, Columbia Sportswear Company. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/24/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
October 4, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF DATED SEPTEMBER 26, 2016 re 53 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Nicolas Stathakos, Jeanne Stathakos. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/4/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
May 2, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 38 Motion to Dismiss. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
March 7, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; STAYING DISCOVERY; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Court STAYS discovery in this case through 3/21/2016.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeanne Stathakos, et al v. Columbia Sportswear Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Stathakos
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Stathakos
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Wayne Scott Kreger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Sportswear Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?