Pacific Bell Telephone Company et al v. 88 Connection Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Pacific Bell Telephone Company, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC, Illinois Bell Telephone Company, Indiana Bell Telephone Company, Incorporated, Nevada Bell Telephone Company, The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company and Wisconsin Bell, Inc.
Defendant: 88 Connection Corporation and Gang Zhao
Case Number: 3:2015cv04554
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:10761
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
March 14, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs' ex parte application for order authorizing alternative service of process. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/14/2016. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 29, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For good cause, the court extends the time period for service of the complaint and summons for an additional 90 days from the date of this order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and vacates the initial case-management conference n ow set for March 31, 2016, and resets it to July 14, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement due on July 7, 2016. The court will issue a separate order regarding service shortly. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/29/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
December 21, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OTHER DEADLINES IN CURRENT CASE SCHEDULE: Re 12 Proposed Order, filed by BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC, The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Nevad a Bell Telephone Company, Wisconsin Bell, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, Illinois Bell Telephone Company, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, Indiana Bell Telephone Company, Incorporated A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/21/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Bell Telephone Company et al v. 88 Connection Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Anne M Selin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By: Anne M Selin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Anne M Selin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana Bell Telephone Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Anne M Selin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Anne M Selin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Anne M Selin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Anne M Selin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Bell, Inc.
Represented By: Anne M Selin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 88 Connection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gang Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?