Lee, et al v. The Hertz Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Peter Lee and Latonya Campbell
Defendant: Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc. and The Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv04562
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 47 MOTION TO DISMISS AND REMANDING CASE TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
July 15, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 42 STIPULATION CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 11:00 AM. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
February 26, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 13 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
December 18, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING 13 MOTION TO STAY FOR JANUARY 21, 2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/18/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 17, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING 13 MOTION TO STAY FOR MARCH 17, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/17/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee, et al v. The Hertz Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lee
Represented By: Meredith Patricia Desautels Taft
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Stephanie Paula Funt
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Campbell
Represented By: Meredith Patricia Desautels Taft
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Stephanie Paula Funt
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Dolinko
Represented By: Charles M. Dyke
Represented By: Matthew J. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Robert A. Dolinko
Represented By: Charles M. Dyke
Represented By: Matthew J. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?