Shrem v. Southwest Airlines Co.

Plaintiff: Jean Shrem and Marni Fischer
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04567
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 53 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING 52 MOTION TO STRIKE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
August 8, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 14 MOTION TO DISMISS; ORDER DENYING 45 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
January 21, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/23/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/21/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 15, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation re 12 Clerk's Notice,, Adjourning Case Management Conference (Civ. L. R. 6-2(a)). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 2, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Williams, Nicole. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shrem v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Bruce John Zabarauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Shrem
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marni Fischer
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?