Lagree et al v. Spartacus 20th LP (NV) et al

Plaintiff: Sebastien Lagree and SPX Fitness, Inc.
Defendant: Spartacus 20th LP (NV), Spartacus 20th Properties, L.P., Spartacus 20th Properties G.P., Inc., BodyROK Franchise, L.P., BodyROK Franchise G.P., Inc., Exercise Technologies, L.P., Philip R. Palumbo, Jakob Irion and Sculpt Fitness Berkeley, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv04592
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 45 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jakob Irion, Philip R. Palumbo, BodyROK Franchise, L.P., Spartacus 20th Properties, L.P., Spartacus 20th Properties G.P., Inc., BodyROK Franchise G.P., Inc., Sculpt Fitness Berkeley, LLC, Spartacus 20th LP (NV), Exercise Technologies, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
April 20, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 45 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jakob Irion, Philip R. Palumbo, BodyROK Franchise, L.P., Spartacus 20th Properties, L.P., Spartacus 20th Properties G.P., Inc., BodyROK Franchise G.P., Inc., Sculpt Fitness Berkeley, LLC, Spartacus 20th LP (NV), Exercise Technologies, L.P. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 11, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 45 MOTION for Attorney Fees to Enlarge Time for Opposition and Reply filed by Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
March 23, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 14, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Stay filed by Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 3, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 Stipulation To Stay And Proposed Order filed by Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 21, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Exchange of Initial Disclosures 1/26/2016. ADR Deadline 2/12/2016. Deadline to amend the pleadings 2/12/2016. Defendants Answer to Complaint 2/26/2016. Fact Discovery Opens 2/29/2016. Plaintiffs Disclosures of Asserted Clai ms and Infringement Contentions 4/22/2016. Defendants Invalidity Contentions 6/10/2016. Exchange of Proposed Terms for Construction 6/24/2016. Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions 7/22/2016. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statemen t 8/5/2016. Completion of Claim Construction Discovery 9/9/2016. Plaintiffs Opening Claim Construction Brief 9/23/2016. Defendants Claim Construction Responsive 10/7/2016. Plaintiffs Claim Construction Reply Brief 10/21/2016. Tutorial Hearing se t for 11/1/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/15/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery - Withdrawing Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
December 17, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc. filed by Sebastien Lagree, SPX Fitness, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 17, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagree et al v. Spartacus 20th LP (NV) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartacus 20th LP (NV)
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartacus 20th Properties, L.P.
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartacus 20th Properties G.P., Inc.
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BodyROK Franchise, L.P.
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BodyROK Franchise G.P., Inc.
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exercise Technologies, L.P.
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip R. Palumbo
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakob Irion
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sculpt Fitness Berkeley, LLC
Represented By: Kevin W. Alexander
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Represented By: Michael D. Kanach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastien Lagree
Represented By: John Paul Flynn
Represented By: Madeleine E. Greene
Represented By: Eugene Marder
Represented By: Jennifer J. Schmidt
Represented By: Stefani Elise Shanberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPX Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: John Paul Flynn
Represented By: Madeleine E. Greene
Represented By: Eugene Marder
Represented By: Jennifer J. Schmidt
Represented By: Stefani Elise Shanberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?